E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3307
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5890
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2966
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2543
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2479
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5056
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1994
|
Journal Page: 5055
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5055
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5055
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4938
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4938
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4609
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1924
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1924
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1447
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1994
|
Journal Page: 5055
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5055
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5055
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 929
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 901
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 876
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 876
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 876
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 881
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 769
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1924
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 216
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|