Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB699 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/24/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Eckhardt S.B. No. 699
 (In the Senate - Filed February 3, 2023; February 17, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 April 24, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 24, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the continuation of a health care provider
 participation program by a certain hospital district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 298E.004, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 298E.004.  EXPIRATION.  (a)  Subject to Section
 298E.153(d), the authority of a district to administer and operate
 a program under this chapter expires December 31, 2027 [2023].
 (b)  This chapter expires December 31, 2027 [2023].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *