Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB699 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/08/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 699


 AN ACT
 relating to the continuation of a health care provider
 participation program by a certain hospital district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 298E.004, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 298E.004.  EXPIRATION.  (a)  Subject to Section
 298E.153(d), the authority of a district to administer and operate
 a program under this chapter expires December 31, 2027 [2023].
 (b)  This chapter expires December 31, 2027 [2023].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 699 passed the Senate on
 April 27, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 29, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 699 passed the House on
 May 6, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 82, Nays 56, one present
 not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor