LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB711
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB711
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB711
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/02/2023
9:00 am
State Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
Senate Chamber
SB147
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: May 4 2023 8:56PM
SB711
Introduced
Last Action: 03/02/2023 S Left pending in committee
SB728
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB372
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23