Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB728 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 28, 2023
Bill February 7, 2023
Bill February 7, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 11, 2023
Analysis May 11, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 3, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis May 29, 2023
Bill May 17, 2023
Bill May 17, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 29, 2023
Analysis May 11, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023
Analysis February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 3, 2023
Fiscal Note March 1, 2023