E | 05/19/2023 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/19/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2243 | |
E | 05/10/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1751 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3855 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1742 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1697 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 3711 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1670 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 1670 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Read | Journal Page: 1670 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1668 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 1500 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Record vote | RV#879 | Journal Page: 2716 |
House | 05/02/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2716 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2716 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | Journal Page: 2554 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Amended | 1-Bonnen | Journal Page: 2552 |
House | 05/01/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2552 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 3056 | Journal Page: 2552 |
House | 04/26/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2195 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 1007 | |
House | 04/04/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1007 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 984 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 580 | |
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 383 | |
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 278 | |
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |