Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB758 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 14, 2023
Bill February 7, 2023
Bill February 7, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 1, 2023
Analysis April 26, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill May 1, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 27, 2023
Fiscal Note April 14, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 26, 2023
Analysis April 14, 2023