E | 05/23/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 05/23/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2543 | |
E | 05/11/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1817 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4045 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1787 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1751 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1706 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3505 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3507 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Record vote | RV#1308 | Journal Page: 3507 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3507 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3507 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3476 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3476 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2326 | Journal Page: 3476 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3713 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2462 | |
House | 04/28/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2462 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2335 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1401 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1363 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1363 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1363 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1363 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1363 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1363 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1363 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1083 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2462 | |
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 281 | |
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |