E | 05/24/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 05/24/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2684 | |
E | 05/15/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1929 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4313 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1900 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1859 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1845 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Record vote | RV#1663 | Journal Page: 4188 |
House | 05/12/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4188 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4188 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Record vote | RV#1557 | Journal Page: 4000 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4000 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3998 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2211 | Journal Page: 3998 |
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2791 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | Journal Page: 1494 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1494 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1389 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Record vote | RV#1663 | Journal Page: 4188 |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4188 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 868 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 867 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 867 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 867 | |
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 769 | |
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1494 | |
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 284 | |
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |