Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB785 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/11/2023

                    By: Birdwell, Blanco S.B. No. 785
 (In the Senate - Filed February 8, 2023; March 1, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
 Economic Development; April 11, 2023, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 1; April 11, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 785 By:  Birdwell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the ownership of the geothermal energy and associated
 resources below the surface of land.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 141.003(5), Natural Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (5)  "By-product" means any other element found in a
 geothermal formation which is brought to the surface, whether or
 not it is used in geothermal heat or pressure inducing energy
 generation. The term does not include:
 (A)  a mineral, as defined by Section 75.001,
 Property Code; or
 (B)  oil, gas, or a product of oil or gas, as
 defined by Section 85.001.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 141, Natural Resources
 Code, is amended by adding Section 141.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 141.004.  OWNERSHIP OF GEOTHERMAL ENERGY AND ASSOCIATED
 RESOURCES. (a) Except as otherwise expressly provided by a
 conveyance, contract, deed, reservation, exception, limitation,
 lease, or other binding obligation, the geothermal energy and
 associated resources below the surface of land are owned as real
 property by:
 (1)  the landowner; or
 (2)  if the surface estate and the mineral estate of the
 land have been severed, the owner of the surface estate of the land.
 (b)  Subject to the provisions of this chapter, the property
 rights described by this section entitle the owner of the
 geothermal energy and associated resources below the surface of
 land and the owner's lessee, heir, or assignee to drill for and
 produce the geothermal energy and associated resources.
 (c)  This section does not apply to minerals dissolved or
 otherwise contained in groundwater, including in hot brines.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *