Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB785 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 27, 2023
Bill February 8, 2023
Bill February 8, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 17, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 11, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 20, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 20, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2023
Bill April 11, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note April 9, 2023
Fiscal Note March 29, 2023