House
|
05/15/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1527
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1527
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1343
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 852
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Statement(s) submitted
|
|
Journal Page: 856
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 856
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 856
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 856
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 855
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA29 Creighton
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA29 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA28 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA27 Middleton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA26 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA25 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA24 Creighton
|
Journal Page: 845
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment adopted as amended FA24 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 845
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA24 Creighton
|
Journal Page: 844
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment to amendment offered FA24 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA23 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA22 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA21 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA20 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA19 Miles
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA18 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA17 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA16 Gutierrez
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA15 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA14 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA13 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA12 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA11 Paxton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA10 Campbell
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA9 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA8 Hancock
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA7 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA6 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA5 Creighton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA4 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA3 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 830
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 705
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1527
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 373
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|