Senate | 04/17/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1003 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 396 | |
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 285 | |
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 285 | |
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |