Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB814 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/04/2023 8:30 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/25/2023 H Referred to Business & Industry: Apr 25 2023 5:13PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 S Left pending in committee