Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB821 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/30/2023

                    By: Nichols S.B. No. 821
 (In the Senate - Filed February 9, 2023; March 1, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 March 30, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; March 30, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 821 By:  Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the review by the Sunset Advisory Commission of the sale
 of personal data by state agencies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 325, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 325.0124 to read as follows:
 Sec. 325.0124.  REVIEW OF AGENCY'S SALE OF PERSONAL DATA.
 (a)  In this section, "personal data" means any information
 relating to an identified or identifiable individual that directly
 or indirectly identifies the individual by reference to:
 (1)  an identifier for the individual, including a
 name, an identification number, location information, or an online
 identifier; or
 (2)  one or more factors specific to the physical,
 physiological, genetic, mental, economic, cultural, or social
 identity of the individual.
 (b)  As part of its review of a state agency, the commission
 shall determine whether the state agency sells personal data the
 agency possesses. If the state agency sells personal data, the
 commission shall determine:
 (1)  to whom the personal data is sold;
 (2)  to the extent possible, the purpose for which the
 personal data is sold;
 (3)  the amount the state agency receives for the sale
 of the personal data; and
 (4)  the law that authorizes the state agency to sell
 the personal data.
 (c)  The commission shall recommend prohibiting the sale of
 personal data by a state agency, unless the commission identifies a
 compelling state or public interest justifying the state agency's
 authority to sell the personal data.  If the commission recommends
 continuing the state agency's authority to sell personal data, the
 commission shall make any recommendations it considers necessary to
 protect the personal data from improper use and dissemination.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *