Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB821 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 19, 2023
Bill February 10, 2023
Bill February 10, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 10, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill April 5, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Analysis January 31, 2024
Bill March 30, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis June 6, 2023
Bill May 17, 2023
Bill May 17, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 6, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2023
Bill March 30, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 1, 2023
Fiscal Note March 29, 2023
Fiscal Note March 16, 2023