Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB825 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 12, 2023
Bill February 10, 2023
Bill February 10, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 6, 2023
Analysis May 5, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 21, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis May 24, 2023
Bill May 15, 2023
Bill May 15, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 24, 2023
Analysis May 5, 2023
Analysis March 12, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 6, 2023
Bill March 21, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 22, 2023
Fiscal Note March 11, 2023