Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB829 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 27, 2023
Bill February 10, 2023
Bill February 10, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 21, 2023
Analysis May 20, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 3, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2023
Bill April 3, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note March 31, 2023
Fiscal Note March 28, 2023