Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB833 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 28, 2023
Bill February 10, 2023
Bill February 10, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 19, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2023
Bill May 11, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 5, 2023
Analysis May 4, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 27, 2023
Bill May 24, 2023
Bill May 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 27, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis May 4, 2023
Analysis April 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill May 5, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 4, 2023
Fiscal Note May 1, 2023