Senate | 03/07/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 328 | |
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 288 | |
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 288 | |
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 328 | |
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 234 | |
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |