Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB839 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 3, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 11, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 10, 2023
Fiscal Note April 3, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023