E
|
05/24/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
05/24/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2684
|
E
|
05/12/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1859
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4216
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1833
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1817
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4048
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1805
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1805
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1805
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1805
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1644
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3380
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1264
|
Journal Page: 3380
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3380
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3380
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3322
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Lalani and Ancha
|
Journal Page: 3322
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3321
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 3548
|
Journal Page: 3321
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3074
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2332
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2332
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2194
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1360
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1345
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1345
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1345
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1345
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1345
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1345
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1345
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1358
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1083
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2332
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 289
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|