House
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4998
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1924
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1924
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1468
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 960
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 963
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 963
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 963
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 962
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 963
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 901
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 901
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 901
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Hancock
|
Journal Page: 900
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 900
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 900
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 806
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1924
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 290
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|