LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB874
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB874
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB874
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/29/2023
9:00 am
Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.012
SB558
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/11/2023 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 11 2023 8:26PM
SB712
Introduced
Last Action: 03/29/2023 S Left pending in committee
SB785
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
SB786
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB874
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: Apr 28 2023 2:39PM
SB1057
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB1158
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB1186
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective immediately
SB1210
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB1397
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB2107
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/03/2023 H Referred to Energy Resources: May 3 2023 4:20PM