Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB887 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 10, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 12, 2023
Analysis May 11, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2023
Bill May 4, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 28, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis July 6, 2023
Bill May 15, 2023
Bill May 15, 2023

Analysis

Analysis July 6, 2023
Analysis May 11, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2023
Bill April 28, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 25, 2023