E
|
05/29/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
E
|
05/17/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2066
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4550
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2010
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1988
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1951
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4345
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1736
|
Journal Page: 4344
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4344
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4344
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4268
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1702
|
Journal Page: 4267
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4267
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4267
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2578
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 982
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 706
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 701
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 701
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 701
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 701
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 700
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 700
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Kolkhorst
|
Journal Page: 700
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 700
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 698
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4267
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Postponed
|
3/30/23 11:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 671
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Johnson
|
Journal Page: 669
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 669
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 669
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 638
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 294
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|