House | 04/03/2023 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 982 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 982 | |
House | 03/29/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 958 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 658 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Statement(s) submitted | Journal Page: 649 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 649 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 649 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 649 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 648 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 656 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 648 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 648 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 630 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 630 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 630 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Hughes | Journal Page: 630 |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 630 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 636 | |
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 581 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 543 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 982 | |
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 301 | |
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |