House | 04/25/2023 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 2042 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2042 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1839 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1189 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1189 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1189 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1189 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1121 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Amendment fails of adoption | Journal Page: 1121 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Eckhardt | Journal Page: 1121 |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1121 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 929 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 849 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 338 | |
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2042 | |
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 307 | |
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |