Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR10

Caption

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 25, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, January 31, 2023.

Impact

The adoption of SCR10 has a direct impact on the legislative process and schedule, facilitating the houses to take a longer break if needed without disrupting the statutory requirements for legislative sessions. This allows lawmakers the flexibility to manage their legislative duties and deliberations effectively. Furthermore, by enabling a longer recess, it can help ensure that members have adequate time to discuss and refine bills and other matters without the urgency of returning immediately to session.

Summary

S.C.R. No. 10 is a Senate Concurrent Resolution introduced by Senator Whitmire that grants permission for the Texas Legislature to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on January 25, 2023, and ending on January 31, 2023. This resolution is necessary under Section 17 of Article III of the Texas Constitution, which stipulates that neither house may adjourn for more than three days without the consent of the other house. The resolution was adopted by both the Senate and the House through a vote demonstrating significant legislative support.

Sentiment

Sentiment surrounding the resolution appears overwhelmingly positive, as indicated by the high number of votes in favor during the roll call (29-0 in the Senate and 141-1 in the House). The broad support may reflect a general understanding among legislators regarding the need for collaboration and flexibility in managing the legislative calendar. Moreover, this resolution likely reflects a cooperative atmosphere among members, assuring that procedural requirements do not hinder efficient governance.

Contention

While SCR10 passed with minimal opposition, the single dissenting vote in the House suggests there may be some concerns regarding the frequency and duration of legislative adjournments. Such resolutions could lead to discussions about accountability and transparency, particularly in the context of public engagement with the legislative process. Therefore, while the resolution is primarily procedural, its implications for legislative dynamics and member accountability warrant ongoing consideration.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HCR26

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 27, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 2, 2021.

TX HCR41

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 23, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 2, 2021.

TX HCR72

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 8, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 13, 2023.

TX HCR24

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2023.

TX HCR37

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 9, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 16, 2021.

TX HCR49

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 3, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 9, 2021.

TX HCR45

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 22, 2015, and ending on Monday, January 26, 2015.

TX HCR9

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, April 17, 2019, and ending on Tuesday, April 23, 2019.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.