E | 06/09/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3309 | |
E | 05/22/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2429 | |
House | 05/22/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4980 | |
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2291 | |
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2243 | |
Senate | 05/18/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2071 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Record vote | RV#1782 | Journal Page: 4421 |
House | 05/17/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4421 | |
House | 05/17/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 4421 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Postponed | 5/17/23 12:00 PM | Journal Page: 4269 |
House | 05/15/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4269 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2195 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 1706 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1634 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1000 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1000 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1000 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1000 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1004 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 958 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 685 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 252 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 186 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 186 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 191 | |
Senate | 11/14/2022 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/14/2022 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |