House | 04/28/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2465 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1792 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1095 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1095 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1095 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1095 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Border Security | Journal Page: 366 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 366 | |
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |