House | 05/12/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 4044 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3859 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1739 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1739 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1739 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1739 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1745 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1609 | |
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1541 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1447 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 542 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 472 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 472 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |