E | 05/10/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1751 | |
E | 05/01/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1448 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2575 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1423 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1401 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1371 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2187 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Record vote | RV#584 | Journal Page: 2186 |
House | 04/26/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2186 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2186 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HCR 20 | Journal Page: 2186 |
House | 04/24/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2049 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 1008 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 986 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 708 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 708 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 708 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 708 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 618 | |
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 472 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 472 | |
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |