House | 05/23/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 5303 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1301 | |
House | 03/20/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 774 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 428 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 428 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read | Journal Page: 428 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 428 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |