Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR38 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 23, 2023
Bill
Analysis

House Committee Report

Bill

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill

Senate Committee Report

Witness List
Analysis
Bill

Enrolled

Bill May 9, 2023
Analysis
Bill

Analysis

Analysis July 6, 2023
Analysis April 25, 2023
Analysis April 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 5, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023