Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR42 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill
Analysis

House Committee Report

Bill

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill

Senate Committee Report

Witness List
Bill

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2023
Analysis
Bill

Analysis

Analysis July 6, 2023
Analysis April 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023