E | 05/05/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1609 | |
E | 04/24/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1239 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1926 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1232 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1130 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1713 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1713 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | Journal Page: 1496 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1448 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 928 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |