E | 05/19/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2243 | |
E | 05/09/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1697 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3710 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1663 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1656 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1634 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Record vote | RV#1224 | Journal Page: 3314 |
House | 05/06/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3314 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3314 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HCR 107 | Journal Page: 3314 |
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3211 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2465 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2339 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1361 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1361 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1361 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1361 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1238 | |
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1001 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1001 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1001 | |
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |