Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR8 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2023
Bill
Analysis

House Committee Report

Bill

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2023
Bill

Senate Committee Report

Bill

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2023
Bill
Analysis

Analysis

Analysis July 6, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2023
Bill March 30, 2023