Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR29 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2023
Bill
Analysis
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2023
Bill

Senate Committee Report

Witness List
Analysis
Fiscal Note
Bill

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 6, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 6, 2023
Fiscal Note March 20, 2023