E | 04/26/2023 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 1360 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2190 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1357 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1360 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1317 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1985 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Record vote | RV#486 | Journal Page: 1985 |
House | 04/25/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1985 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1985 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HJR 79 | Journal Page: 1985 |
House | 04/24/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2049 | |
House | 04/24/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 1496 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1496 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1389 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 869 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 869 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 869 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 869 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 868 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 868 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 868 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1496 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 218 | |
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |