House
|
05/23/2023
|
Postponed
|
9/1/23 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 5114
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5114
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Corrected comm. report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4997
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4834
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1301
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1301
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 812
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 508
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 481
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 481
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 481
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 481
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 481
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 481
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 480
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 507
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 476
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 368
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1301
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 239
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|