Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR5 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2023
Bill
Analysis
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill

Senate Committee Report

Witness List
Analysis
Fiscal Note
Bill

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 4, 2023
Fiscal Note April 2, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 3, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023