LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SJR75
Draft Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SJR75
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SJR75
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
March 6, 2023
Compare
Fiscal Note
Analysis
Bill
Compare
House Committee Report
Bill
Compare
Fiscal Note
Analysis
Witness List
Engrossed
Bill
April 3, 2023
Compare
Bill
Compare
Fiscal Note
Senate Committee Report
Bill
Compare
Fiscal Note
Analysis
Witness List
Senate Amendments Printing
Fiscal Note
Enrolled
Bill
May 29, 2023
Compare
Analysis
Fiscal Note
Bill
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
June 14, 2023
Analysis
May 11, 2023
Analysis
March 20, 2023
Analysis
March 17, 2023
Fiscal Note
Fiscal Note
May 28, 2023
Fiscal Note
May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note
May 11, 2023
Fiscal Note
April 17, 2023
Fiscal Note
March 20, 2023
Fiscal Note
March 19, 2023
Comm Sub
Bill
May 11, 2023
Compare
Bill
March 21, 2023
Compare
Conference Committee Report*
Bill
Compare
Fiscal Note