Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR130 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/07/2023

                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 130
 In Memory
 of
 Robert Stanley Wright Sr.
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of Dr. Robert Stanley Wright Sr., who died
 on December 28, 2022, at the age of 99; and
 WHEREAS, Born on July 31, 1923, Robert Stanley Wright Sr.
 was an exemplary citizen and an esteemed member of the Austin
 community; a native Austinite and a lifelong resident of the
 capital city, Robert graduated from Austin High School and went
 on to attend The University of Texas at Austin; and
 WHEREAS, Robert served with distinction as a flight
 instructor in the United States Marines Air Corps from 1943
 through 1946, and he concluded his active duty with the rank of
 captain; after returning to Texas, he enrolled as a student at
 Texas Chiropractic College, and on June 21, 1947, Robert was
 joined in marriage with Carolyn Porter; and
 WHEREAS, After graduating in 1950 from Texas Chiropractic
 College, Robert joined his father in the Wright Family
 Chiropractic practice in Austin, which his father had founded in
 1920; he practiced alongside his father at the family's
 chiropractic office located on West 12th Street, where it still
 remains today, and he continued to serve as a trusted physician
 to the Austin community throughout seven decades; and
 WHEREAS, Dr. Bob, as he was affectionately known by many,
 was noted for his expertise and his personable and empathetic
 manner, and he was beloved by his staff and patients; in 1994, he
 was joined in the practice by his own son, Dr. Billy Wright, and
 more recently, his grandson Dr. Tyler Wright also joined the
 family practice; he retired in 2021, confident in leaving the
 practice in the hands of the third and fourth generations of
 Wright family chiropractors; and
 WHEREAS, An avid and accomplished outdoorsman, Robert took
 great pleasure in deer hunting; he appreciated any opportunity to
 exercise his skill as a pilot, and he especially enjoyed flying
 the surplus military plane he and a friend had purchased and kept
 in a hangar on Koenig Lane; he was an active member of his church
 community at Hyde Park Baptist Church, where he served the
 congregation for many years as a deacon and as a teacher and
 leader; and
 WHEREAS, Robert and his cherished wife, Carolyn, shared 64
 years of devoted marriage until her passing in 2011; they were
 blessed with a daughter, Sue Alison Peschel, and two sons, Robert
 Stanley Wright Jr. and James William Wright; his seven
 grandchildren and his 13 great-grandchildren were a source of
 much pride and joy to him; and
 WHEREAS, A beloved husband, father, and grandfather and a
 man of strong character and faith, his generous spirit was a
 source of inspiration to others, and he leaves behind memories
 that will be treasured by his many loved ones and by all who were
 privileged to share in his life; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 88th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Robert Stanley Wright Sr.; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Robert Stanley Wright.
 Eckhardt
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on February 7, 2023, by
  a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate