Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR14 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 01/18/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 14
 In Memory
 of
 Mollie Upton
 WHEREAS, Memories of a life well lived may help to comfort
 those saddened by the passing of Mollie Jeanette Upton of
 Longview on August 25, 2022, at the age of 66; and
 WHEREAS, The former Mollie Smith was born to Euel and
 Marlena Smith in Bronte on June 4, 1956, and she grew up with the
 companionship of seven siblings, Barbara, James, Mike, Patricia,
 Gary, Richard, and Steve; she moved with her family to White Oak,
 where she later graduated from White Oak High School, and she
 went on to earn an associate's degree from Kilgore College; and
 WHEREAS, On November 19, 1976, she married Paul Upton, with
 whom she shared a fulfilling union that spanned more than 45
 years; she took great pride in her three children, Dustin,
 Dexter, and Dakota, and with the passing years, she had the
 pleasure of seeing her family grow to include her two
 grandchildren, Luke and Chase; and
 WHEREAS, Mrs. Upton enjoyed a rewarding career as a letter
 carrier for the United States Postal Service for more than 25
 years, and she made many lasting friendships with her colleagues
 and customers; in her leisure hours, she loved playing games,
 camping with her family, and cheering for her children as they
 played various sports; a woman of deep faith, she was a valued
 congregant of White Oak United Methodist Church; and
 WHEREAS, Although her loss is difficult to bear, Mollie
 Upton leaves behind numerous friends and loved ones whose lives
 are far richer for having known her, and they will forever hold
 her close in their hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 88th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the memory of Mollie Jeanette
 Upton and extend sincere condolences to all who mourn her
 passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Mollie Upton.
 Hughes
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on January 18, 2023, by
  a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate