Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR42 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 01/19/2023

                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 42
 In Memory
 of
 Larry Solomon
 WHEREAS, Family, friends, and colleagues will forever
 treasure their memories of Officer Larry Solomon Jr. of the
 Longview Police Department, who passed away on January 7, 2023,
 at the age of 30; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Henderson on March 25, 1992, to Larry and
 Patricia Solomon, Larry Solomon grew up with the companionship of
 three sisters, Regina, Tasha, and Trisha, and three brothers,
 Marcus, Joshua, and Anthony; he was a 2010 graduate of
 Mt. Enterprise High School, where he played football and
 basketball for the Wildcats, and he went on to answer his
 nation's call to duty by enlisting in the United States Marine
 Corps; he was assigned as a field wireman and was twice deployed
 to Afghanistan, in 2011 and 2013; during his military service, he
 was awarded a Navy and Marine Corps Achievement Medal and a Good
 Conduct Medal; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Solomon met his future wife, Shawna, while
 stationed at Marine Corps Base Camp Pendleton; the couple wed on
 July 27, 2013, and they later became the parents of two sons,
 Kameron and Jace; and
 WHEREAS, Having set his sights on a career in law
 enforcement as a young man, Mr. Solomon accepted a position with
 the Longview Police Department in 2015; after serving as a patrol
 officer for five years, he was selected to train as a K-9 handler,
 and he enjoyed the bond of camaraderie he shared with his K-9
 partner, Jiro; in the course of his tenure with the department,
 Officer Solomon was recognized with a Lifesaving Award for his
 heroic actions in rescuing a motorist from a burning vehicle; he
 was also honored as Rookie of the Year and as Officer of the
 Month, and he was respected and admired by all who worked with him
 for his calm professionalism and his unwavering commitment to
 duty; and
 WHEREAS, Officer Solomon was a devoted husband, father,
 brother, and son, and he cherished the time he spent with his
 family and his friends; outside of work, he enjoyed tending to
 his yard and taking on various outdoor projects; and
 WHEREAS, The untimely passing of Larry Solomon has
 profoundly saddened everyone who was privileged to know this
 courageous and dedicated young officer, and his record of
 service to his community will not soon be forgotten; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 88th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life of Officer Larry
 Solomon Jr. and extend heartfelt condolences to his loved ones
 and to his many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Officer Larry Solomon Jr.
 Hughes
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on January 18, 2023, by
  a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate