SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 504 In Memory of Tommy Williams WHEREAS, A life made rich though meaningful service drew to a close with the passing of former Atascosa County sheriff Tommy Williams on April 8, 2023, at the age of 86; and WHEREAS, Tommy Williams was born on February 25, 1937; answering his nation's call to duty, he joined the U.S. Army in 1957, and he proudly served for six years; and WHEREAS, On January 1, 1973, Mr. Williams became sheriff of Atascosa County, and in the course of his tenure, he earned statewide recognition and the deep respect and admiration of his colleagues for his generosity, professionalism, and steadfast commitment to duty; he ultimately concluded his time in office on December 31, 2012, after four decades of dedicated service; a leader in his field, he was a Lifetime Member and past president of the Sheriffs' Association of Texas; and WHEREAS, Blessed with a devoted family, Mr. Williams shared a rewarding marriage with his wife, Sandra, who preceded him in death; he took great pride in their daughter, Amber, and with the passing years, he had the pleasure of welcoming into his family a granddaughter, Paige, and a grandson, John; and WHEREAS, A man of honesty and integrity who made an indelible impact in his community, Tommy Williams leaves behind a legacy that will long be treasured by all those who held him dear; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 88th Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the memory of Tommy Williams and extend sincere condolences to the members of his family: to his daughter, Amber Carter, and her wife, Calli; to his granddaughter, Paige Merryman; to his grandson, John Merryman; to his cousin, Darrell Hickey, and his wife, Sandy; to his bonus daughters, Dicki Lee Poppell-Sparks and Minda Hyde; and to his other relatives and many friends; and, be it further RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Tommy Williams. Flores ________________________________ President of the Senate I hereby certify that the above Resolution was adopted by the Senate on May 3, 2023, by a rising vote. ________________________________ Secretary of the Senate ________________________________ Member, Texas Senate