Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR504 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 504
2- In Memory
3- of
4- Tommy Williams
5- WHEREAS, A life made rich though meaningful service drew to
6- a close with the passing of former Atascosa County sheriff Tommy
1+88R26687 TBO-D
2+ By: Flores S.R. No. 504
3+
4+
5+ R E S O L U T I O N
6+ WHEREAS, A life made rich though meaningful service drew to a
7+ close with the passing of former Atascosa County sheriff Tommy
78 Williams on April 8, 2023, at the age of 86; and
89 WHEREAS, Tommy Williams was born on February 25, 1937;
910 answering his nation's call to duty, he joined the U.S. Army in
1011 1957, and he proudly served for six years; and
11- WHEREAS, On January 1, 1973, Mr. Williams became sheriff
12- of Atascosa County, and in the course of his tenure, he earned
12+ WHEREAS, On January 1, 1973, Mr. Williams became sheriff of
13+ Atascosa County, and in the course of his tenure, he earned
1314 statewide recognition and the deep respect and admiration of his
1415 colleagues for his generosity, professionalism, and steadfast
1516 commitment to duty; he ultimately concluded his time in office on
1617 December 31, 2012, after four decades of dedicated service; a
17- leader in his field, he was a Lifetime Member and past president
18- of the Sheriffs' Association of Texas; and
19- WHEREAS, Blessed with a devoted family, Mr. Williams
20- shared a rewarding marriage with his wife, Sandra, who preceded
21- him in death; he took great pride in their daughter, Amber, and
22- with the passing years, he had the pleasure of welcoming into his
23- family a granddaughter, Paige, and a grandson, John; and
24- WHEREAS, A man of honesty and integrity who made an
25- indelible impact in his community, Tommy Williams leaves behind a
26- legacy that will long be treasured by all those who held him dear;
27- now, therefore, be it
28- RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 88th
29- Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the memory of Tommy Williams
30- and extend sincere condolences to the members of his family: to
31- his daughter, Amber Carter, and her wife, Calli; to his
32- granddaughter, Paige Merryman; to his grandson, John Merryman;
33- to his cousin, Darrell Hickey, and his wife, Sandy; to his bonus
34- daughters, Dicki Lee Poppell-Sparks and Minda Hyde; and to his
35- other relatives and many friends; and, be it further
18+ leader in his field, he was a Lifetime Member and past president of
19+ the Sheriffs' Association of Texas; and
20+ WHEREAS, Blessed with a devoted family, Mr. Williams shared a
21+ rewarding marriage with his wife, Sandra, who preceded him in
22+ death; he took great pride in their daughter, Amber, and with the
23+ passing years, he had the pleasure of welcoming into his family a
24+ granddaughter, Paige, and a grandson, John; and
25+ WHEREAS, A man of honesty and integrity who made an indelible
26+ impact in his community, Tommy Williams leaves behind a legacy that
27+ will long be treasured by all those who held him dear; now,
28+ therefore, be it
29+ RESOLVED, That the Senate of the 88th Texas Legislature
30+ hereby pay tribute to the memory of Tommy Williams and extend
31+ sincere condolences to the members of his family: to his daughter,
32+ Amber Carter, and her wife, Calli; to his granddaughter, Paige
33+ Merryman; to his grandson, John Merryman; to his cousin, Darrell
34+ Hickey, and his wife, Sandy; to his bonus daughters, Dicki Lee
35+ Poppell-Sparks and Minda Hyde; and to his other relatives and many
36+ friends; and, be it further
3637 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
37- prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
38- this day, it do so in memory of Tommy Williams.
39- Flores
40- ________________________________
41- President of the Senate
42- I hereby certify that the
43- above Resolution was adopted by
44- the Senate on May 3, 2023, by a
45- rising vote.
46- ________________________________
47- Secretary of the Senate
48- ________________________________
49- Member, Texas Senate
38+ prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns this
39+ day, it do so in memory of Tommy Williams.