Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR504 Introduced / Bill

Filed 05/03/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    88R26687 TBO-D
 By: Flores S.R. No. 504


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A life made rich though meaningful service drew to a
 close with the passing of former Atascosa County sheriff Tommy
 Williams on April 8, 2023, at the age of 86; and
 WHEREAS, Tommy Williams was born on February 25, 1937;
 answering his nation's call to duty, he joined the U.S. Army in
 1957, and he proudly served for six years; and
 WHEREAS, On January 1, 1973, Mr. Williams became sheriff of
 Atascosa County, and in the course of his tenure, he earned
 statewide recognition and the deep respect and admiration of his
 colleagues for his generosity, professionalism, and steadfast
 commitment to duty; he ultimately concluded his time in office on
 December 31, 2012, after four decades of dedicated service; a
 leader in his field, he was a Lifetime Member and past president of
 the Sheriffs' Association of Texas; and
 WHEREAS, Blessed with a devoted family, Mr. Williams shared a
 rewarding marriage with his wife, Sandra, who preceded him in
 death; he took great pride in their daughter, Amber, and with the
 passing years, he had the pleasure of welcoming into his family a
 granddaughter, Paige, and a grandson, John; and
 WHEREAS, A man of honesty and integrity who made an indelible
 impact in his community, Tommy Williams leaves behind a legacy that
 will long be treasured by all those who held him dear; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the 88th Texas Legislature
 hereby pay tribute to the memory of Tommy Williams and extend
 sincere condolences to the members of his family: to his daughter,
 Amber Carter, and her wife, Calli; to his granddaughter, Paige
 Merryman; to his grandson, John Merryman; to his cousin, Darrell
 Hickey, and his wife, Sandy; to his bonus daughters, Dicki Lee
 Poppell-Sparks and Minda Hyde; and to his other relatives and many
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns this
 day, it do so in memory of Tommy Williams.